Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Goria

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1571Born
17 Aug 161139.8AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
28 Aug 161139.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
3 Jan 164876.1DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Goria
Bishop Giacomo Goria (born , died ) Bishop of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafranca d'Asti

  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,302
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 364
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018