Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Bellolatto

Deceased

Bishop of Bisceglie, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571¹Born
8 Mar 162756.1AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
21 Mar 162756.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
15 Jul 163665.5DiedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Bellolatto
Bishop Nicola Bellolatto (born 1571, died ) Bishop of Bisceglie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSant’Andrea della Valle, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 368
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 38
  • ob/c2: AT, 21 Jan 2019
  • c34: CB, 21 Jan 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,064

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Apr 2019

Quantcast