Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Girolamo Matteucci

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1544¹BornFano
1 Jun 157935.4AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
8 Aug 158339.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Sarno, Italy
Dec 1587³43.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
8 Jan 159046.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
5 Dec 159450.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
21 Jan 160965.0DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Matteucci
Archbishop Girolamo Matteucci (born 1544, died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 281, and Page 336
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016