Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maffeo Venier

Deceased

Archbishop of Corf¨


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1550BornVenezia
11 May 158332.9AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
10 Jul 158333.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
1586¹35.6DiedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maffeo Venier:
Archbishop Maffeo Venier (born ) Archbishop of Corf¨

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 178
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 21, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013