Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Gualterio

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1513Born
30 Jan 155138.0AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
21 Mar 155138.1Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
1554²40.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
1556²42.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
29 Mar 156047.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
10 May 156148.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
16 Sep 156653.6DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Gualterio (VIAF: 43108032)
Bishop Sebastiano Gualterio (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrvieto, Diocese of Orvieto
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,811
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 336
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 269
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1551, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast