Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Fratellini

Deceased

Bishop of Fossombrone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1803BornVetralla
31 Mar 182723.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 185147.1AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
24 Feb 185147.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
13 Apr 188480.2DiedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Fratellini (VIAF: 88919261)
Bishop Filippo Fratellini (born , died ) Bishop of Fossombrone

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Dec 2016