Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Farnese

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Parma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1542BornLatera
27 Aug 157229.7AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
4 Oct 157229.8Ordained BishopBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
30 Mar 157330.3AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
1 Aug 160663.7ResignedBishop of Parma, Italy
27 Aug 160663.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Farnese:
Bishop Ferdinando Farnese (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Parma

  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 270, and Page 249
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 21, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013