Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Muzio Cardinal Gallo

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1721BornOsimo
22 Sep 177049.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Feb 178563.8AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
14 Feb 178563.8Elevated to Cardinal
Mar 1785²63.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 178563.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
17 Apr 178564.0Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
13 Dec 180180.6DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Muzio Gallo:
Muzio Cardinal Gallo (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a priest for 16.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
  • a cardinal for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Feb 1785
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 444

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 15 Jan 2016