Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martino Bianchi

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1720BornLucca
30 May 174424.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 177049.8AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
19 Mar 177049.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
26 Dec 178868.6DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Martino Bianchi:
Archbishop Martino Bianchi (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013