Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Vinci

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Switzerland

Titular Archbishop of Berytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1736BornFermo
28 Mar 178548.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 178548.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Berytus
24 Apr 178548.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Berytus
6 Jul 178548.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
Jan 1794³57.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
30 Sep 179559.1DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Vinci (VIAF: 315976157)
Archbishop Giuseppe Vinci (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Switzerland

  • a priest for 10.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 122
  • bp: CB, 6 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 14
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016