Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Anton Blatter

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1745³Born
18 Feb 176923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
4 Aug 179045.4SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
29 Nov 179045.7ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
13 Feb 179145.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
19 Mar 180762.0DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anton Blatter
Bishop Joseph Anton Blatter (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViège
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sion, Diocese of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 372
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,629
  • ob/c2+: ATh
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 4
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,435

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 19 Jun 2020

Quantcast