Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste d’Odet

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1752³BornFribourg
23 Sep 177523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Switzerland
27 Jun 179643.9AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
30 Nov 179644.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
29 Jul 180350.9DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste d’Odet
Bishop Jean-Baptiste d’Odet (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,507
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 Mar 2016