Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Ruffo Scilla

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1750BornSant'Onofrio
20 May 178029.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 178534.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Bithynia
24 Apr 178534.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Bithynia
26 Apr 178534.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Other
23 Aug 179343.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
23 Feb 180150.5Elevated to Cardinal
9 Aug 180252.0AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
9 Aug 180252.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
17 Nov 183282.2DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ruffo Scilla:
Luigi Cardinal Ruffo Scilla (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.6 years
  • a cardinal for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 90
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1801
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014