Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Angelo Buono

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Derbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1769³BornNapoli
25 May 179324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Sep 181950.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Derbe
14 Nov 181950.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Derbe

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Angelo Buono
Bishop Michael Angelo Buono (born ) Titular Bishop of Derbe

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 174
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 May 2016