Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Carelli

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1748Born
14 Mar 177224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Conversano, Italy
2 Feb 182071.8SelectedBishop of Conversano, Italy
21 Feb 182071.9ConfirmedBishop of Conversano, Italy
2 Apr 182072.0Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
14 Apr 182678.0DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Carelli
Bishop Nicola Carelli (born , died ) Bishop of Conversano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConversano

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 162
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast