Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcello Maria Benci

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1743Born
2 Apr 176824.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 180763.7AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
12 Apr 180763.7Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
27 Jan 181066.5DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Maria Benci
Bishop Marcello Maria Benci (born , died ) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontepulciano

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 5
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast