Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Maria Caccamo, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1744Born
14 Mar 176722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
19 Dec 176723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
4 Sep 181570.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
17 Sep 181570.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
29 Jul 182075.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Maria Caccamo
Archbishop Salvatore Maria Caccamo O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Italy

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 232
  • d: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018