Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Baptiste Gillis

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

Titular Bishop of Amyzon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1679BornLiege
22 Sep 170324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
9 Jul 172949.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium
9 Jul 172949.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
8 Sep 172950.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
1 Dec 173657.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean Baptiste Gillis:
Bishop Jean Baptiste Gillis (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liège

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015