Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Saverio de Vivo

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1723BornSalerno
19 Dec 175027.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 178663.3SelectedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
18 Dec 178663.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
21 Dec 178663.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
16 Dec 179168.4SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nusco, Italy
27 Feb 179268.6ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nusco, Italy
1797¹73.4DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio de Vivo:
Archbishop Francesco Saverio de Vivo (born , died 1797) Bishop of Nusco

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 251, and Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016