Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ludovico Rizzuti

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1784BornBocchigliero
21 Apr 181025.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 183954.9SelectedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
23 Dec 183955.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
12 Jan 184055.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
4 Aug 184864.2DiedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Rizzuti:
Archbishop Ludovico Rizzuti (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona)

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 331
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013