Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geremia Nicola Antonio Cosenza, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Foggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1807Born
182517.0ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
26 Feb 183123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
23 Feb 187264.1AppointedBishop of Foggia, Italy
3 Mar 187264.1Ordained BishopBishop of Foggia, Italy
15 Jan 188274.0DiedBishop of Foggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Geremia Nicola Antonio Cosenza
Bishop Geremia Nicola Antonio Cosenza O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Foggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoccascalegna, Archdiocese of Lanciano
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 273
  • ob/c2+/d: AT, 2 Dec 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Jan 2017