Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Romero, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Sep 1607ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
14 May 1618AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
20 May 1618Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
11 Jan 1621AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Vigevano, Italy
16 Jul 1635DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francisco Romero
Archbishop Francisco Romero O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 214, and Page 369
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 64, Number 374
  • ob/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 136, Number 871
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,618, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast