Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Cantoli, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1812Born
28 May 183624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
22 Dec 187159.6AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
27 Dec 187159.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
16 Oct 188472.4DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Cantoli (VIAF: 208988336)
Bishop Alessandro Cantoli O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Bovino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrecchio, Archdiocese of Lanciano (e Ortona)
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 155
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017