Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernabé de Castro, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1644³Born
25 Feb 169752.6AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
3 Mar 169752.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
15 Dec 170056.5AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
11 Dec 170763.4DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernabé de Castro
Archbishop Bernabé de Castro O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManrique

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 129, and Page 235
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 239, Number 1,481
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018