Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Frosini

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1654³BornPistoia
9 Mar 168631.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Jun 168632.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 170146.8AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
13 Feb 170146.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
2 Oct 170248.5AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
20 Nov 173379.6DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Frosini:
Archbishop Francesco Frosini (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 6 May 2015