Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Antonio Scotti

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640¹Born
24 Jan 170161.0AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
13 Feb 170161.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
12 Mar 170868.1DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Antonio Scotti
Archbishop Tommaso Antonio Scotti (born 1640, died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVigevano

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast