Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Mongi˛ Galatino, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550¹Born
21 Jun 159646.4AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
1605²55.0ResignedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
1606²56.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
27 Jan 161060.0AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
20 Nov 161767.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Pozzuoli, Italy
11 Feb 163080.1DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Mongi˛ Galatino
Archbishop Lorenzo Mongi˛ Galatino O.F.M. Obs. (born 1550, died ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchdiocese of Otranto

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 214, and Page 289
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 243
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1596, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018