Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franšois Martinengo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nice, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Oct 1600AppointedBishop of Nice, France
28 Oct 1600Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
22 Aug 1620DiedBishop of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Franšois Martinengo
Bishop Franšois Martinengo O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Nice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCercenasco

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 258
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 36, Number 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1600, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018