Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Roca de la Serna

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540¹BornValencia
4 Jul 160565.5AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
30 Nov 160565.9Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
27 Mar 160868.2DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Roca de la Serna:
Bishop Vicente Roca de la Serna (died ) Bishop of Albarracin

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 74
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 121, Number 768

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015