Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Marimón

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558¹BornCervera del Maestre
2 Jun 160850.4AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
21 Sep 160850.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
17 Jan 161355.0DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Marimón:
Bishop Felipe Marimón (died ) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 81
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 107
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 124, Number 789

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015