Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Tasso

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Oct 1588AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
15 Jan 1589Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
2 Sep 1607DiedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Tasso
Archbishop Paolo Tasso (died ) Archbishop of Lanciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSan Giacomo degli Spagnoli, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 218
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 19*
  • ob/c2+: AT, 16 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast