Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Gallo

Deceased

Bishop of Nola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545¹Born
1 Jul 158540.5AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
21 Sep 158540.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nola, Italy
5 Nov 161469.8DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Gallo (VIAF: 50116826)
Bishop Fabrizio Gallo (born 1545, died ) Bishop of Nola

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Barthelemy en l'ile, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 260
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 23, Number 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast