Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcantonio Bizzoni

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1586AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
26 Jan 1586Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
Jul 1587³AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
26 May 1589ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
26 Apr 1606DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Bizzoni
Bishop Marcantonio Bizzoni (died ) Bishop of Foligno

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 199
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 24, Number 107
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016