Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Bentivoglio

Deceased

Bishop of Città di Castello, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jun 1577AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
Sep 1577³Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
26 Nov 1581AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
19 Sep 1602DiedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Bentivoglio
Bishop Ludovico Bentivoglio (died ) Bishop of Città di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Monte, Church, Bologna, Diocese of Bologna
Death PlaceCappucins Friars, Convent, Città di Castello, Diocese of Città di Castello
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Città di Castello, Diocese of Città di Castello

  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 169, and Page 277
  • ob/c2: AT, 28 Oct 2017
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Number 17*
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,551

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast