Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Annibale Grassi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Faenza

Apostolic Nuncio to Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1537²BornBologna
23 Jul 157538.5AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
1585¹48.0ResignedBishop of Faenza, Italy
27 Aug 158851.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
24 Jun 159053.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Faenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Annibale Grassi (VIAF: 63966541)
Bishop Annibale Grassi (born 1537, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Faenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 194
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Oct 2016