Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Ridolfi, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Feb 1587AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
24 Feb 1587Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
18 Feb 1591AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
18 May 1601DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Ridolfi:
Bishop Pietro Ridolfi O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Senigallia

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 312
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 330, and Page 298
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 26, Number 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013