Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Toschi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1535Born
10 May 159559.9AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
21 May 159559.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
3 Mar 159963.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 159963.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
25 Jul 160469.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
31 Jul 160671.1ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
5 May 161074.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
26 Mar 162084.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Domenico Toschi (VIAF: 30589736)
Domenico Cardinal Toschi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastellarano, Diocese of Reggio Emilia
Ordained BishopGesù, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)San Pietro in Montorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
  • a cardinal for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 337
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 313
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast