Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Emilio Cardinal Zacchia

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554²BornCastello di Vezzano
3 Mar 159945.1Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 159945.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
14 May 160147.3AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
27 May 160147.4Ordained BishopBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
31 May 160551.4DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Emilio Zacchia:
Paolo Emilio Cardinal Zacchia (died ) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
  • a cardinal for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015