Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Lapis

Deceased

Bishop of Fano


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Apr 1603AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
11 May 1603Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
2 Jun 1622DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Lapis:
Bishop Tommaso Lapis (died ) Bishop of Fano

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 184
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015