Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Manrique

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹Born
20 Oct 160444.8AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
24 Oct 160444.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
27 Sep 1612³52.7DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Manrique:
Archbishop Alfonso Manrique (died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 123
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 42, Number 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013