Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leone Fedele, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lavello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561¹Born
7 Jan 160544.0AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
23 Jan 160544.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
Jan 1613³52.0DiedBishop of Lavello, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leone Fedele
Bishop Leone Fedele O.S.B. (born 1561, died Jan 1613) Bishop of Lavello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVimercate

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 3
  • ob: AT, 12 Mar 2017
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017