Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Della Cioppa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alife

Titular Bishop of Caesarea in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1886BornBellona
18 Dec 190923.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 194357.4AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
17 Jul 194357.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
19 Mar 194458.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
2 Dec 194761.8AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
1 Apr 195367.1ResignedBishop of Alife, Italy
1 Apr 195367.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Numidia
18 Oct 195872.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Alife, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Della Cioppa:
Bishop Giuseppe Della Cioppa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alife

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,226
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 6
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015