Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo de Vincentiis

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1775BornCasoli
21 Dec 179924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chieti, Italy
7 Oct 184873.0SelectedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
22 Dec 184873.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
18 Mar 184973.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
14 May 186791.6DiedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo de Vincentiis
Archbishop Giacomo de Vincentiis (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona)

  • a priest for 67.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 331
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016