Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Gallo

Deceased

Bishop of Bitonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1611BornLatertiae
3 Oct 167261.5AppointedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
9 Oct 167261.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bitonto, Italy
Sep 168574.4DiedBishop of Bitonto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Gallo:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Gallo Bishop of Bitonto

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013