Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo della Palma, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1613¹BornNola
2 Apr 167562.2SelectedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
27 May 167562.4ConfirmedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
3 Jun 167562.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
1682²69.0DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo della Palma:
Bishop Carlo della Palma C.R. , Bishop of Pozzuoli

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 325
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,483
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,221
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015