Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Delfino

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1617BornVenice
23 Jun 165639.2AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy
23 Jun 165639.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thagaste
30 Nov 165639.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thagaste
29 Dec 165740.7SucceededPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
7 Mar 166749.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Jul 166750.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Salvatore in Lauro
19 May 167053.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
19 Jul 169982.2DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Delfino:
Cardinal Giovanni Delfino (born , died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

  • a bishop for 42.6 years
  • a cardinal for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Mar 1667
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 90
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,844

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013