Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Buonvisi

Deceased

Bishop of Lucca

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1607BornLucca
17 Jul 165144.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
30 Jul 165144.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
9 Apr 165749.9Elevated to Cardinal
23 Apr 165749.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
28 May 165750.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lucca, Italy
21 Feb 167769.7DiedBishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Buonvisi:
Cardinal Girolamo Buonvisi (born , died ) Bishop of Lucca

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
  • a cardinal for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Apr 1657
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 114, Number 694
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 214, and Page 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013