Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Argoli

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1594BornAvezzano
May 1650³55.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 165157.1AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
5 Nov 165157.1Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
26 Apr 165459.6DiedBishop of Veroli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Argoli:
Bishop Alessandro Argoli (born , died ) Bishop of Veroli

  • a priest for 3.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 365
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 27 Mar 2015