Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Jany

Deceased

Bishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1641³BornNovati
2 Feb 167331.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 169755.7SelectedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
1 Jul 169756.1ConfirmedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
27 Oct 169756.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
Apr 1702³60.9DiedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Jany:
Bishop Francesco Jany (born , died Apr 1702) Bishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium)

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015