Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulus von Milicz

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jan 1435AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
31 Jul 1435Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
2 May 1450DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Paulus von Milicz
Bishop Paulus von Milicz (died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 206
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,723

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018